THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:03:02 AM
Xue, Shuwen
CPSO#:
79679
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 345
600 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 915-9411
Fax: (519) 915-8992
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHUWEN XUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XUE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Aug 2003
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2005 |