THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:48:18 PM
Lace de Almeida, Claudia
CPSO#:
79675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Almeida, Claudia Lace de (used until: 05 Jul 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade do Estado do Rio de Janeiro, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Hsc 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75242
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Cardiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2023 |
|
Active |