THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:58:27 AM
Pfeiffer, Any Zuleika
CPSO#:
79670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: (289) 386-0811
Fax: (289) 715-2231
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Pfeiffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2010 |
|
Active |