THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:17:20 AM
Morgan, Scott Carlyle
CPSO#:
79666
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70206
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:06 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT CARLYLE MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2009 |