THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:15:58 PM
Fortier, Anne Michelle
CPSO#:
79665
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100-679 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Phone: 9058531212
Fax: 9058531214
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2009 |