THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:54:15 PM
Green, Kristy-Jill Renee
CPSO#:
79629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTY-JILL RENEE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2006 |