THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:49:35 AM
Good, David James
CPSO#:
79628
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Dept of Pathology and Molecular Med
Richardson Laboratory Room 201d
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2823
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2008 |