THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:32:48 AM
Djordjevic, Bojana
CPSO#:
79627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology and Laborat
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-2956
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOJANA DJORDJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJORDJEVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2010 |