THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:21:44 AM
Freeman, Sloane Jaye
CPSO#:
79623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hechter, Sloane Jaye (used until: 01 Dec 2003 )
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sloane Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 19 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SLOANE JAYE FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2008 |