THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:45:54 PM
Leaf, Suzanne
CPSO#:
79588
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Leaf, Suzanne Carol (used until: 19 Jul 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Minnesota, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
456 Talbot Street
REAR ENTRANCE
St Thomas ON N5P1B9
Phone: (519) 207-3018
Fax: (519) 637-0449
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUZANNE LEAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2004 |