THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:20:17 PM
Mailloux, Caroline
CPSO#:
79565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Marceau-Mailloux, Caroline (used until: 26 Sep 2007 )
Mailloux, Caroline (used until: 27 Jun 2005 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Rd
Sudbury
Sudbury ON P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jan 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE MAILLOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAILLOUX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2006 |