THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 8:53:55 AM
Kherani, Safeena
CPSO#:
79561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO 7662
Al Jaddaf, Dubai, UAE
Al Jalila Children's Hospital
Al Jaddaf 00000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971 55 193 67 Ext. 60
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Safeena Kherani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may request a copy of their medical records by sending an email to [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jan 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAFEENA KHERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2009 |