THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:52:28 PM
Leiva, Rene Antonio
CPSO#:
79532
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENE ANTONIO LEIVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 26 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |