THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:13:01 PM
Dahman, Jehad Jay
CPSO#:
79529
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Dahman, Jehad (used until: 30 May 2005 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Downsview Pediatric Urgent Care
877 Wilson Ave., Unit 13
Toronto ON M3K 1E6
Phone: 647-351-7337
Fax: 647-351-7339
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Maine
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Aug 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 08 Aug 2003
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |
|
Active |