THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:18:42 PM
Berard, Roberta Audrey
CPSO#:
79511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Western On
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8266
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERTA AUDREY BERARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 18 Apr 2008
EL - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Paediatric Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2008 |