THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:16:11 AM
Sachs, Adam Joshua
CPSO#:
79509
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
C2220-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-761-5383
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:21 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM JOSHUA SACHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACHS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2012 |