THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:52:03 AM
Guram, Karmdeep Singh
CPSO#:
79503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4268
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARMDEEP SINGH GURAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2009 |