THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:27:53 PM
Naymark, Sharon Ilana
CPSO#:
79449
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON ILANA NAYMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYMARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2008 |