THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:23:42 AM
Meek, Murray Dean
CPSO#:
79444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MURRAY DEAN MEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2005 |