THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:06:17 PM
Hung, Anthony Richard Tam
CPSO#:
79424
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Queenway West
Trillium Hospital
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487580
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Hung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Palliative Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY RICHARD TAM HUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 01 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2009 |