THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:44:27 PM
Hamilton, Robert James
CPSO#:
79420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2909
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 18 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2012 |