THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:08:35 AM
Gyomorey, Sandor
CPSO#:
79418
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Hungarian
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDOR GYOMOREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GYOMOREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2009 |