THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:56:45 AM
Gnanapandithen, Kumudini
CPSO#:
79414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7601
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KUMUDINI GNANAPANDITHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GNANAPANDITHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2008 |