THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:14:22 PM
Cayen, Barry Robert Hoffman
CPSO#:
79395
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Downsview Orthopaedic &
Arthritis Centre
2nd Floor
3695 Keele St
North York ON M3J 1N2
Phone: (416) 479-8969
Fax: (416) 981-7675
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARRY ROBERT HOFFMAN CAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)