THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:24:03 AM
Jinapriya, Delan
CPSO#:
79376
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Galen Eye Centre
Suite 100
27 Place d'Armes
Kingston ON K7K 6Z6
Phone: (613) 507-4800
Fax: (613) 507-4801
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DELAN JINAPRIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINAPRIYA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |