THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:48:55 PM
Saposnik, Gustavo
CPSO#:
79371
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 931
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5155
Fax: (416) 864-5150
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:14 Nov 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2003 to 21 Jul 2003
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2015 |
|
Active |