THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:23:29 AM
Qian Lee, Ivy Hai-Ping
CPSO#:
79359
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
377 Church Street
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5733
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVY HAI-PING QIAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QIAN LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 16 Oct 2006 to 15 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 16 Oct 2007 to 15 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2008 |