THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:51:56 PM
Cho, Charles Young
CPSO#:
79346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES YOUNG CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2009 |