THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:52:08 PM
Audcent, Tobey Ann Mary
CPSO#:
79335
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2701
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOBEY ANN MARY AUDCENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUDCENT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 03 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2008 to 03 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2008 |