THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:11:25 PM
Tartaglia, Maria Carmela
CPSO#:
79323
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto
Division of Neurology
Room 5WW 449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5483
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA CARMELA TARTAGLIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARTAGLIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2011 |