THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:34:53 AM
Foster, Jennifer Ruth
CPSO#:
79253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: JR Foster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Apr 2024 |