THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:05:39 AM
Araghi, Golbarg
CPSO#:
79242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7750 Bayview Ave
Shouldice Hospital
Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Phone: 905-889-1125
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For storage of medical records for practice at 9160 bayview, richmond hill, which closed as of feb 2022 please use the below address:
Website: https://medrecords.ca/
Address:
MedRecords Distribution Association
PO Box 999
Stn. Main
Port Coquitlam, BC
V3B 6H9
Phone: 778 806 1176
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 06 Jul 2023
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact MedRecords Distribution Association: P.O. Box 999, Stn. Main, Port Coquitlam, BC., V3B 6H9. Telephone: 778-806-1176, Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 29 Jun 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GOLBARG ARAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAGHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2022 |