THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:47:25 PM
Yim, Annabella Chi-Ka
CPSO#:
79232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
GNMI MRI & CT, XRAY & ULTRASOUND
Mississauga ON L5R 3K6
Phone: 905-626-8641
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNABELLA CHI-KA YIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2009 to 15 Feb 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |