THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:29:35 AM
Kumar, Rajat
CPSO#:
79227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
16 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Delhi, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3961
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJAT KUMAR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KUMAR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. KUMAR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 May 2003 to 01 Aug 2003
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2003 to 04 Sep 2003
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2018 |