THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:10:32 AM
Tajirian, Tania
CPSO#:
79200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, Armenian, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30515
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tania Tajirian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TANIA TAJIRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAJIRIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2005 |