THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:21:49 AM
Habdank-Kossowski, Katherine Maria Walewski
CPSO#:
79187
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Walewski, Katherine Maria (used until: 30 Jun 2003 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:28 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARIA WALEWSKI HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABDANK-KOSSOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 8, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Habdank-Kossowski in respect of an incident that took place in December 2003, during an emergency medicine rotation in her first year of residency.