THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:55:18 AM
Wong, Ivan Ho-Bun
CPSO#:
79154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dalhousie University - Camp Hill
Verterans Memorial Building
2nd Floor, Room 2106
5955 Veterans Memorial Lane
Halifax NS B2H 2E1
Phone: (902) 473-7626
Fax: (902) 425-3879
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Cayman Islands
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN HO-BUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2009 |