THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:39:09 AM
Migay, Andrew Stanislaus
CPSO#:
79133
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Box 3251 35 Algoma St. North
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW STANISLAUS MIGAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
EL - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2003 |