THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:01:24 AM
Clarke, Jo-Anne Marie
CPSO#:
79126
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NE Specialized Geriatric Centre
960 Notre Dame Avenue Unit D
Sudbury ON P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 688-3970
Fax: (705) 688-7720
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:28 Feb 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JO-ANNE MARIE CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |