THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:32:50 AM
Thomas, Gordon Robert
CPSO#:
79122
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6772
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital |
Alexandria |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GORDON ROBERT THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Jan 2009
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |