THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:56:25 AM
Maharaj, Neil
CPSO#:
79117
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
4728 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7H9
Phone: (289) 296-3157
Fax: (905) 353-1269
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:31 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2005 to 20 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
EL - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2007 |