THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:08:24 AM
Thakur, Varsha
CPSO#:
79113
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Division of Cardiology, The Hos
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6140
Fax: 4168137547
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VARSHA THAKUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2012 |