THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:39:14 AM
Mar, Melanie Christa
CPSO#:
79106
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-39 Campus Trail
Huntsville ON P1H 0E5
Phone: 705-789-4377
Fax: 705-789-1640
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jan 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE CHRISTA MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 Feb 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2006 |