THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:52:24 PM
Scholes, Michelle Lynn
CPSO#:
79093
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
1206 Centre Street
Thornhill ON L4J 3M9
Phone: (905) 907-9998
Fax: (905) 907-9098
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
|
Active |