THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:34:29 PM
Wiebe, Scott Christopher
CPSO#:
79092
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Div of Physical Medicine & Rehab
Room 1105C
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8M2
Phone: (613) 737-7350 Ext. 75598
Fax: (613) 739-6974
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT CHRISTOPHER WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |