THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 12:10:31 PM
Tsang, Jennifer Lai-Yee
CPSO#:
79089
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
Critical Care Department
Room 2B
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 42919
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAI-YEE TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |