THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:13:52 AM
Simms, Kathryn Andrea
CPSO#:
79087
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cayuga Medical Center
101 Dates Drive
Ithaca NY 14850
United States
Phone: (607) 2744011
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kathryn Simms Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANDREA SIMMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |