THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:58:09 PM
Holden, Dean Albert
CPSO#:
79085
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEAN ALBERT HOLDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLDEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 22 Oct 2007
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2009 |