THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 18:47:42 PM
Lacroix, Julie Denise Marie
CPSO#:
79037
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa, Ontario
K1K 0T2
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-748-4930
Fax: 613-748-4958
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Sep 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:19 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE DENISE MARIE LACROIX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACROIX is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 18 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 18 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Oct 2006 to 02 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |