THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:30:02 AM
Kim, George Paul
CPSO#:
79011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Aug 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE PAUL KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2005 |